Camirand v. Crab Shack Acquisition MO, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles E Camirand
Defendant: Crab Shack Acquisition Mo, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv03001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Referring Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Reid, Danielle)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 2/23/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for four days beginning Tuesday, 2/22/2022 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/19/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2021., Discovery Motions due by 8/27/2021., Status Reports due by 4/23/2021, and 7/23/2021.) Discovery due by 9/17/2021. Signed on 2/23/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Charles E Camirand. (Groves, Greggory)
February 3, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/1/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 2/12/2021. Signed on 2/2/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 21-3001-CV-S-MDH. (Melvin, Greg)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Danielle Jean Reid on behalf of Defendant Crab Shack Acquisition Mo, LLC.(Reid, Danielle)
January 29, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
January 13, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. The parties shall hold their Rule 26 conference by no later than 2/5/2021 and file their proposed scheduling order by no later than 2/19/2021. Signed on 1/12/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice to the Parties of Filing of Notice of Removal by Crab Shack Acquisition MO, LLC, incorrectly sued as Joe's Crab Shack, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Pautler, Paul)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Taney County County, case number 2046-CC00273, Crab Shack Acquisition MO, LLC, incorrectly sued as Joe's Crab Shack, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMOWDC-7210533. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Pautler, Paul)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camirand v. Crab Shack Acquisition MO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crab Shack Acquisition Mo, LLC
Represented By: Paul F. Pautler, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Jean Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Camirand
Represented By: Greggory D Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?