Mace v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Larry Mace
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2021cv03055
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of appearance by Douglass A. Kreis on behalf of Larry Mace (Attorney Douglass A. Kreis added to party Larry Mace(pty:pla))(Kreis, Douglass)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 motion Douglass A. Kreis to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 Motion to allow Douglass A. Kreis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7357634) filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Larry Mace. (Lucius, Lydia)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Larry Mace (Attorney Lydia Lucius added to party Larry Mace(pty:pla))(Lucius, Lydia)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to stay. Signed on 3/29/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings and Suggestions in Support filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed on 3/22/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Akiesha Gilcrist Sainvil for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to allow Akiesha Gilchrist Sainvil to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7315180) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Enjolique A Lett for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to allow Enjolique A. Lett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7312546) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 3, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/15/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/31/2021. Signed on 3/1/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02731.
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21271 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2731-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15898519 filed by Larry Mace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mace v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Akiesha Gilcrist Sainvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Akiesha Gilcrist Sainvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Mace
Represented By: Wilfried H Florin
Represented By: Douglass Alan Kreis
Represented By: Eric P Czelusta
Represented By: Lydia Lucius
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?