Milliman v. Howell County, MO et al
Plaintiff: Lance Gerald Milliman
Defendant: Levi Stoops, Howell County, MO, Michael P. Hutchings, Bethany Hanson Turner, Scott L. Nelson and Robert David Ray
Case Number: 6:2021cv03119
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 motion ; granting #19 motion. The United States Marshal Service is ordered to attempt personal service on all named defendants. Signed on 6/30/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary) Modified on 6/30/2021 (Maerz, Mary).
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 PRO SE MOTION for order Order Requiring the United States Marshal Service to Personally Serve Process filed by Lance Gerald Milliman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope)(Siegert, Karen)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 motion to quash. Signed on 6/22/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 PRO SE MOTION for order requiring the Marshall's Service to personally serve process filed by Lance Gerald Milliman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Siegert, Karen)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to quash on behalf of Plaintiff Lance Gerald Milliman. Affidavit of Lance Milliman in Response to Defendants Motion for Sanctions. Reply suggestions due by 7/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(Related document(s) #12 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 ***QUASHED pursuant to order entered 6/22/21 Doc. #18 ***RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed Michael P. Hutchings served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Keller, Jeanne) Modified on 6/24/2021 (Siegert, Karen).
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 ***QUASHED pursuant to order entered 6/22/21 Doc. #18 ***RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed Howell County, MO served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Keller, Jeanne) Modified on 6/24/2021 (Siegert, Karen).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #5 motion for TRO. Signed on 6/8/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to quash filed by John S Spurlock on behalf of Howell County, MO, Michael P. Hutchings. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Spurlock, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by John S Spurlock on behalf of Howell County, MO, Michael P. Hutchings (Attorney John S Spurlock added to party Howell County, MO(pty:dft), Attorney John S Spurlock added to party Michael P. Hutchings(pty:dft))(Spurlock, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service unexecuted as to Levi Stoops. REMARK: USMS received USM-299 with notation "This individual is unknown to this office. This office is not a party. Cara Harris, Chief of Litigation MO AGO." (Keller, Jeanne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service unexecuted as to Scott L. Nelson. REMARK: USMS received USM-299 with notation "This individual is unknown to this office. This office is not a party. Cara Harris, Chief of Litigation MO AGO." (Keller, Jeanne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service unexecuted as to Bethany Hanson Turner. REMARK: USMS received USM-299 with notation "This individual is unknown to this office. This office is not a party. Cara Harris, Chief of Litigation MO AGO." (Keller, Jeanne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service unexecuted as to Robert David Ray. REMARK: USMS received USM-299 with notation "This individual is unknown to this office. This office is not a party. Cara Harris, Chief of Litigation MO AGO." (Keller, Jeanne)
May 25, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Howell County, MO, Michael P. Hutchings, Scott L. Nelson, Robert David Ray, Levi Stoops, Bethany Hanson Turner. Received completed Summonses and USM-285s from Plaintiff. USM-285s, Summonses, Complaint and Order [Doc. #2] delivered to USMS for service. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE MEMORANDUM in support re #5 MOTION for temporary restraining order on behalf of Plaintiff Lance Gerald Milliman. (Related document(s) #5 ). NEF mailed to Lance Milliman, 60009 373rd Street, Eden Valley, Minnesota 55329. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Lance Gerald Milliman. [Prepared Proposed Order forwarded to Courtroom Deputy.] Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Lance Milliman, 60009 373rd Street, Eden Valley, Minnesota 55329. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing by Lance Gerald Milliman. PRO SE Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Injunction. [Prepared Proposed Order forwarded to Courtroom Deputy.] (Attachments: #1 Envelope) NEF mailed to Lance Milliman, 60009 373rd Street, Eden Valley, Minnesota 55329. (Keller, Jeanne)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lance Gerald Milliman. Service due by 8/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegert, Karen)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically file the Complaint as of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court shall also forward the appropriate process forms to plaintiff. Within twenty (20) days, plaintiff shall return the completed summons and service forms to the Clerk's Office showing the address where defendant(s) may be served. Upon receipt, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue summons and process and deliver same to the United States Marshal for service upon the defendant(s), pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Marshal is permitted to attempt service by mail. Signed on 5/11/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Maerz, Mary)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lance Gerald Milliman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Complaint #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) #7 Envelope) (Keller, Jeanne). NEF mailed to Lance Milliman, 60009 373rd Street, Eden Valley, MN 55329. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milliman v. Howell County, MO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell County, MO
Represented By: John S Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Hutchings
Represented By: John S Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Hanson Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert David Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Gerald Milliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?