Harris v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Warren Harris
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv03159
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(MacKay, Derek)
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Grant Rahmeyer on behalf of Plaintiff Warren Harris.(Rahmeyer, Grant)
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 8/2/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/19/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2022 at 9:30 AM Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 8/2/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/2/2021. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Grant Rahmeyer. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Killian Walsh. Time in court: 2:32 p.m. to 2:42 p.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
July 28, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Stephen Snead(Rahmeyer, Grant)
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (MacKay, Derek)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Auto-Owners Insurance Company filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(MacKay, Derek)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Petition (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. Count II of Plaintiff's Petition for bad faith and punitive damages is DISMISSED. However, Count II for vexatious refusal is not dismissed. Signed on 7/14/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION for order Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (MacKay, Derek)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION for order Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Grant Rahmeyer on behalf of Plaintiff Warren Harris. Reply suggestions due by 7/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Rahmeyer, Grant)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Killian Walsh on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attorney Killian Walsh added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Walsh, Killian)
June 30, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(MacKay, Derek)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION for order Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (MacKay, Derek)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for order Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (MacKay, Derek)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/20/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 2:30 p.m. before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 6/25/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Conference call-in numbers will be provided to counsel via email the week prior to the scheduling conference. (Richard, Tracey)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Certification of Filing of Notice of Removal with State Court by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (MacKay, Derek)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Derek H. MacKay on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(MacKay, Derek)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Christian County, case number 21CT-CC00105, filed by Derek H. MacKay. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7464009. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(MacKay, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Harris
Represented By: Grant Rahmeyer
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek H. MacKay
Represented By: Killian Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?