James v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Jeremy James
Defendant: Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards
Case Number: 6:2021cv03163
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Memorandum of Law by Menard, Inc. re #5 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mareschal, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Joshua L. Mareschal on behalf of Menard, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mareschal, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Joshua L. Mareschal on behalf of Menard, Inc. (Attorney Joshua L. Mareschal added to party Menard, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mareschal, Joshua)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by William Jeremy James. Waiver sent to Menard, Inc. on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Lampert, Raymond)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Menard, Inc. filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of William Jeremy James. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7469075. Service due by 9/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampert, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jeremy James
Represented By: Raymond Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards
Represented By: Joshua L. Mareschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?