Griffin v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Leanna Preston Griffin
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 6:2021cv03183
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 7/29/2021 Social security answer due by 9/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 10/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 7/29/21; ORC 7/29/21; Atty Gen 8/2/21)(Young, Kelsey)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Kathleen Overton terminated. Signed on 8/23/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Kelsey Young on behalf of Leanna Preston Griffin (Attorney Kelsey Young added to party Leanna Preston Griffin(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Leanna Preston Griffin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Overton, Kathleen)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is 6:21-cv-03183-RK. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Leanna Preston Griffin. (Filing fee $402 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Leanna Preston Griffin. Service due by 10/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/26/2021 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
July 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons e-mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Leanna Preston Griffin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Leanna Preston Griffin(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 8/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Preston Griffin
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?