Federal Insurance Company v. New Prime, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: New Prime Inc. and Roberto Alonzo
Not Classified By Court: Prime Inc
Case Number: 6:2021cv03243
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER consolidating cases. Signed on November 1, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This case is consolidated with Case No. 6:21-cv-03041-RK. All pleadings/documents shall be filed in the lower numbered case, Case No. 6:21-cv-03041-RK. Signed on November 1, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 motion to substitute attorney. Added attorneys Timothy Michael McAleenan, Jr, and Kelsey Leigh McLean for Federal Insurance Company. Attorney Sarah Russell Smith terminated. Signed on 10/19/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
October 18, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to substitute attorney and Notice of Withdrawal filed by Melissa Ann Vaughn on behalf of Federal Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Melissa Ann Vaughn added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Vaughn, Melissa)
October 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate by New Prime Inc. (Smith, Jason)
October 15, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Jason C. Smith on behalf of New Prime Inc. (Attorney Jason C. Smith added to party New Prime Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Jason)
September 20, 2021 Filing 30 Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Chief District Judge Beth Phillips no longer assigned to the case. Please note new case number:6:21-CV-03243-RK. (Kern, Kendra)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is related to another case previously assigned to the Honorable Roseann A. Ketchmark. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9 and with Judge Ketchmark's consent, this case is transferred to Judge Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Signed on 9/20/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 20, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
September 20, 2021 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00521.
September 17, 2021 Filing 26 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southern Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on September 17, 2021, filed. (ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #11 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is denied as moot as to the motion for extension of time to answer. The Court further orders that this case be transferred to the United States District court for the Western District of Missouri, Southern Division.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc., filed.(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 23 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Federal Insurance Company, filed.(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Federal Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: May/June 2022. ETT: 4 days. Bench trial. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/16/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/20/2021. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/31/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/31/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/1/2021. Scheduling order entered. Appearances: Frederick T Johnson, Sarah Russell Smith.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc., filed.(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Federal Insurance Company, filed.(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties have an additional 14 days to file the parties joint report as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F) and joint discovery/case management plant.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension to File Joint Report Required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan by Federal Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER OR STAY THE ACTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, filed by Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER OR STAY THE ACTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 Notice (Other) of Related Action, filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER OR STAY THE ACTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Roberto Alonzo served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to New Prime, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by New Prime, Inc., filed.(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by New Prime, Inc., filed.(Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION by Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc., filed. (Johnson, Frederick) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Federal Insurance Company, filed.(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JosephWells, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roberto Alonzo, New Prime, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25976416) filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Sarah) [Transferred from txsd on 9/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. New Prime, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Russell Smith
Represented By: Kelsey Leigh McLean
Represented By: Melissa Ann Vaughn
Represented By: Timothy Michael McAleenan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime Inc.
Represented By: Frederick T Johnson
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Alonzo
Represented By: Frederick T Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prime Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?