York et al v. Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Don York, Beverly York, Jacob Stradling, Alisha York-Stradling, Jack Harvey and Judy Harvey
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. and Northrup Grumman Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv03251
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Randy J Soriano on behalf of Defendant Northrup Grumman Corporation.(Soriano, Randy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Randy J Soriano on behalf of Defendant Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc..(Soriano, Randy)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Erin L Brooks on behalf of Northrup Grumman Corporation, Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. (Attorney Erin L Brooks added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Erin L Brooks added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Brooks, Erin)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/30/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/17/2021. Signed on 11/5/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips.(Cordell, Annette)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Randy J Soriano on behalf of Northrup Grumman Corporation, Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. (Attorney Randy J Soriano added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Randy J Soriano added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Soriano, Randy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Peter Bay on behalf of Northrup Grumman Corporation, Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. (Attorney Peter Bay added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Bay added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Bay, Peter)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED, up to and including December 17, 2021. Signed on 10/29/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Thompson, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Robert M. Thompson added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Robert M. Thompson added to party Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc.(pty:dft))(Thompson, Robert)
October 5, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northrup Grumman Corporation, Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc., and emailed to Plaintiffs' counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Due to the request for injunctive relief in the Complaint, case reassigned to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris no longer assigned to case. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Paul A. Lesko on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7603911. Service due by 12/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Lesko, Paul)
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York et al v. Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don York
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly York
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Stradling
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha York-Stradling
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Harvey
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Harvey
Represented By: Brandon Wise
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corporation Guidance and Electronics Company Inc.
Represented By: Randy J Soriano
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Represented By: Erin L Brooks
Represented By: Peter Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Randy J Soriano
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Represented By: Erin L Brooks
Represented By: Peter Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?