USA v. Santiago
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Isrrael Santiago
Case Number: 6:2021cv03253
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 4246
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 9:00 AM via Video Teleconference - Springfield before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION (Sealed). (DO)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Sealed Motion. Signed on 11/5/2021 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO) Modified on 11/5/2021 to reflect NEF mailed to dft Isrrael Santiago at the address listed on the docket (Siegert, Karen).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time, as the deadline at issue, 11/11/21, has not yet passed. Signed on 11/4/21 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO) Modified on 11/5/2021 to reflect NEF mailed to dft Isrrael Santiago at the address listed on the docket (Siegert, Karen).
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by David R. Mercer on behalf of Isrrael Santiago. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mercer, David)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by David R. Mercer on behalf of Isrrael Santiago. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mercer, David)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE (SEALED) by United States of America Report to the Court - State Placement Update (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tilley, Kacey)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The deadline for Defendant to file any motion to dismiss is 11/2/2021; the deadline for Defendant to file a motion for an additional psychiatric or psychological examination is 11/11/2021. Signed on 10/12/21 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David P. Rush, and appointing the Federal Public Defender to represent the Defendant. Signed on 10/08/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR MENTAL STATUS (SEALED) Petition to Determine Present Mental Condition of an Imprisoned Person filed by Kacey Tilley on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tilley, Kacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Represented By: Kacey Tilley
Represented By: Shane Patrick McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isrrael Santiago
Represented By: David R. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?