McDonald v. USA
Petitioner: Clinton D. McDonald
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 6:2021cv03261
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Movant show cause on or before December 6, 2021, why this cause should not be dismissed for failure to assert a viable Rehaif claim. Failure to timely respond may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on November 5, 2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Laine T Cardarella terminated. Signed on 11/1/2021 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Maerz, Mary)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Laine T Cardarella on behalf of Clinton D. McDonald. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Laine T Cardarella added to party Clinton D. McDonald(pty:pet))(Cardarella, Laine)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Casey Michael Clark on behalf of USA (Attorney Casey Michael Clark added to party USA(pty:res))(Clark, Casey)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER pursuant to Rehaif v. United States appointing FPD for Clinton D. McDonald. This appointment is limited to cases affected or potentially affected by Rehaif v. United States. Signed on July 24, 2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 10/5/2021 to reflect copy of NEF and docket sheet mailed to Clinton McDonald (Jones, Robin).
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) Clinton D. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Suggestions in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(Jones, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clinton D. McDonald
Represented By: FPD
Represented By: Laine T Cardarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Casey Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?