Larson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maynard Larson
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv03278
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 19 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 12/21/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2023 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for four days beginning 4/3/2023 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2022., Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2023 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2022., Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2022., Status Report due by 8/15/2022.) Discovery due by 9/1/2022. Signed on 12/21/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maynard Larson re #16 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Ronald G. Cleek on behalf of Plaintiff Maynard Larson. Related document: #16 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Maynard Larson.(Cleek, Ronald)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Maynard Larson. (Cleek, Ronald) (Main Document 16 replaced on 12/20/2021 with a non-editable pdf document and NEF regenerated) (Siegert, Karen).
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maynard Larson. (Cleek, Ronald)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
December 14, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ronald G. Cleek on behalf of Plaintiff Maynard Larson.(Cleek, Ronald)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John C. Holstein(Herring, Jacqueline)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
October 27, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/17/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/1/2021. Signed on 10/26/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jacqueline J. Herring for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by William Clayton Crawford on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Crawford, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to allow Jacqueline J. Herring to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7643382) filed by William Clayton Crawford on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Crawford, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Abbigale A. Gentle on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attorney Abbigale A. Gentle added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Gentle, Abbigale)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by William Clayton Crawford on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Crawford, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Christian County, case number 21CT-CC00212, filed by William Clayton Crawford. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7643276. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court FIle, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crawford, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maynard Larson
Represented By: Ronald G. Cleek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Represented By: Abbigale A. Gentle
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?