Bough v. Cedar County, Missouri
Plaintiff: Carole Bough
Defendant: Cedar County, Missouri
Case Number: 6:2021cv03284
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.AMENDED Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cedar County, Missouri Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production filed by Katherine A. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Cedar County, Missouri.(Thompson, Katherine)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kate Millington on behalf of Plaintiff Carole Bough.(Millington, Kate)
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 12/8/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2022 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for five days beginning 12/12/2022 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2022., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2022 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2022., Discovery Motions due by 3/28/2022., Status Reports due by 2/11/2022 and 4/1/2022.) Discovery due by 12/8/2021. Signed on 12/8/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Katherine A. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Cedar County, Missouri.(Thompson, Katherine)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER And Discovery Plan by Cedar County, Missouri. (Thompson, Katherine)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Brian K. Asberry on behalf of Cedar County, Missouri (Attorney Brian K. Asberry added to party Cedar County, Missouri(pty:dft))(Asberry, Brian)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Cedar County, Missouri.(Thompson, Katherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Melanie McMullen on behalf of Cedar County, Missouri (Attorney Melanie McMullen added to party Cedar County, Missouri(pty:dft))(McMullen, Melanie)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/21/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/7/2021. Signed on 11/3/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) Modified on 11/3/2021 Document deleted as it was duplicate filing (View, Pat).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/21/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/7/2021. Signed on 11/3/21 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cedar County County, case number 21CD-CV00445, filed by Katherine A. Thompson. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7655231. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Thompson, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bough v. Cedar County, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Bough
Represented By: Kate Millington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar County, Missouri
Represented By: Katherine A. Thompson
Represented By: Brian K. Asberry
Represented By: Melanie McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?