White et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Charles Guy White and Michelle White
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv03302
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Filing 25 Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (Doc. #24.) Upon review, the dismissal is GRANTED. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party bearing their own attorney's fees and costs as agreed. Signed on 5/2/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
April 30, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by Charles Guy White, Michelle White. (Stafford, Charles)
March 24, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Guy White, Michelle White Responses and objections to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents filed by Charles B. Stafford on behalf of Plaintiffs Charles Guy White, Michelle White.(Stafford, Charles)
March 24, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle White Objections to Defendant's First Interrogatories filed by Charles B. Stafford on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle White.(Stafford, Charles)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Guy White Answers and Objections to Defendant's First Interrogatories filed by Charles B. Stafford on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Guy White.(Stafford, Charles)
February 24, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Charles Guy White and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Bradley Scott Thomas on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Thomas, Bradley)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Charles Guy White; Defendant First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Michelle White and Defendant First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Bradley Scott Thomas on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Thomas, Bradley)
February 17, 2022 Filing 18 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 2/17/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2023 at 11:30 AM Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 2/17/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2022. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Brandon Stafford. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Bradley Thomas. Time in court: 11:30 a.m. to 11:40 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
February 16, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Stafford, Charles)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Thomas, Bradley)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 motion to remand. Signed on 1/21/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to File Reply Suggestions Out of Time. (Doc. #11.) For good cause and excusable neglect stated, the motion is GRANTED. The Court deems Plaintiffs' Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion to Remand (Doc. #11-1) as properly filed. Signed on 1/21/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to file Reply Suggestions filed by Charles B. Stafford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion to Remand)(Stafford, Charles)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Bradley Scott Thomas on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Thomas, Bradley)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to remand filed by Charles B. Stafford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stafford, Charles)
December 22, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 11:30 a.m. before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Conference call-in numbers will be provided to counsel the week prior via email. (Richard, Tracey)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with case. New case number is 6:21-cv-03302-SRB. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. In accordance with Local Rules 16.1 and 26.1, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 1/28/2022. Signed on 12/16/21 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (GK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Thomas, Bradley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bradley Scott Thomas on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Thomas, Bradley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Thomas, Bradley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Christian County, case number 21CT-CC00227, filed by Bradley Scott Thomas. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7684606. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Bradley)
November 23, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Guy White
Represented By: Charles B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle White
Represented By: Charles B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas S. Beck
Represented By: Bradley Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?