Hadley v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Crisi D Hadley
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 6:2021cv03312
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Frederick "Rick" S. Spencer on behalf of Crisi D Hadley. (Filing fee $402 receipt number KCMO093620) filed byFrederick "Rick" S. Spencer on behalf of Crisi D Hadley. Service due by 4/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Redacted Notice of Decision, #3 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Countil Action)(Spencer, Frederick "Rick")
January 26, 2022 RECEIPT number KCMO093620 in the amount of $201.00 issued to Crisi D Hadley. (Woods, Gloria)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1 Plaintiff Crisi D. Hadleys Application for Leave to File Action Without Payment of Fees, With Affidavit of Financial Status in Support. Plaintiff shall pay a partial filing fee, in the total amount of $201.00, to proceed with this action. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from this date to electronically file the Complaint. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Rule 4(i) ofthe Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed on January 14, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Crisi D Hadley. (Spencer, Frederick "Rick")
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Plaintiff shall file a supplemental Affidavit of Financial Status containing all pertinent information within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to fully review the Order requesting supplementation. Failure to supplement the record may result in the Court denying Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on December 21, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick "Rick" S. Spencer on behalf of Crisi D Hadley. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Attorney Frederick "Rick" S. Spencer added to party Crisi D Hadley(pty:pla))(Spencer, Frederick "Rick")
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadley v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crisi D Hadley
Represented By: Frederick "Rick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?