Renew Biomass LLC v. Vonore Fiber Products LLC
Plaintiff: Renew Biomass LLC
Defendant: Vonore Fiber Products LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv03020
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 The Court hereby acknowledges Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. (Doc. #6). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 3/9/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss case Voluntary with Prejudice filed by Travis A. Elliott on behalf of Renew Biomass LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Elliott, Travis)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #4) is GRANTED. Defendant is granted leave to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 7, 2022. Signed on 3/3/2022 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
February 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Curtis Edward Beem on behalf of Vonore Fiber Products LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Curtis Edward Beem added to party Vonore Fiber Products LLC(pty:dft))(Beem, Curtis)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing of Intent to Use Process Server by Renew Biomass LLC (Elliott, Travis)
January 28, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vonore Fiber Products LLC. Summons e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vonore Fiber Products LLC filed by Travis A. Elliott on behalf of Renew Biomass LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7768091. Service due by 4/21/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Agreement, #3 Exhibit notification, #4 Exhibit amendment, #5 Exhibit notification)(Elliott, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renew Biomass LLC v. Vonore Fiber Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renew Biomass LLC
Represented By: Travis A. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonore Fiber Products LLC
Represented By: Curtis Edward Beem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?