Glasscock v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua Glasscock
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv03095
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Defendant's response to the Complaint is due by June 24, 2022. Signed on 5/24/2022 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Maerz, Mary)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, #6 Return of Service of Complaint Executed Defendant Sig Sauer, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Brenton Dwerlkotte on behalf of Sig Sauer, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 , #6 ) (Attorney David Brenton Dwerlkotte added to party Sig Sauer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dwerlkotte, David)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Defendant Sig Sauer, Inc.'s Suggestions In Opposition To Plaintiff's Notice of Potential Related Case by Sig Sauer, Inc. re #4 Notice of filing (Dwerlkotte, David)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Joshua Glasscock. Sig Sauer, Inc. served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (Dameron, Matthew)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service unexecuted by Joshua Glasscock as to Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Dameron, Matthew)
May 3, 2022 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Sig Sauer, Inc.. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Potential Related Cases by Joshua Glasscock (Dameron, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is 6:22-cv-03095-MDH. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sig Sauer, Inc. filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Joshua Glasscock. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7891937. Service due by 7/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dameron, Matthew)
April 18, 2022 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 5/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
April 18, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sig Sauer, Inc.. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasscock v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Glasscock
Represented By: Todd C. Werts
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?