Christopherson et al v. CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson
Defendant: CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC, CoreLogic Inc., CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC, CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc., Inez Pahlmann, Kimberly Grennan, United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Robert Bushner and Connie Jo Bushner
Case Number: 6:2022cv03106
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on behalf of CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC.(Olthoff, Mark)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order of Dismissal with prejudice per #17 STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice of CoreLogic Inc., CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC, and CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, LLC. Signed on June 17, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
June 16, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Defendant CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC.(Zeeck, Phillip)
June 16, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice of CoreLogic Inc., CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC, and CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, LLC by Derek Christopherson, Jennifer Christopherson. (Stubblefield, Kory)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jennifer Howell on behalf of Defendants Kimberly Grennan, Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Inez Pahlmann.(Howell, Jennifer)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendants CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC; CoreLogic Inc.; CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC; CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC; and CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.'s #14 unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Answer or other response due on or before 6/17/2022. Signed on 5/25/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
May 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC, CoreLogic Inc., CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC, CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/8/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zeeck, Phillip)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case Signed on 5/20/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda)
May 18, 2022 Filing 12 Deft Inez Pahlmann's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Petition on behalf of Inez Pahlmann.(Attorney Jennifer Howell added to party Inez Pahlmann(pty:dft))(Howell, Jennifer)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 Deft Missouri Ozarks Realty Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Petition on behalf of Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc..(Howell, Jennifer)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 Deft United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty Inc's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiffs' Amended Petition on behalf of Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Inez Pahlmann, United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc..(Attorney Jennifer Howell added to party Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Howell added to party United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Howell, Jennifer)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 Deft Kimberly Grennan's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Petition on behalf of Kimberly Grennan.(Attorney Jennifer Howell added to party Kimberly Grennan(pty:dft))(Howell, Jennifer)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 22-3106-CV-S-MDH. (Melvin, Greg)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition. Inez Pahlmann's, Kimberly Grennan's, United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.'s, and Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.'s answers or other responsive pleadings are due on or before 5/18/2022. Signed on May 5, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition, MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Jeffrey J. Brinker on behalf of Kimberly Grennan, Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc., Inez Pahlmann, United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jeffrey J. Brinker added to party Kimberly Grennan(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey J. Brinker added to party Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey J. Brinker added to party Inez Pahlmann(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey J. Brinker added to party United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brinker, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC's, CoreLogic Inc.'s, CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC's, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC's, and CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.'s answers or other responsive pleadings are due on or before 5/27/2022. Signed on April 29, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC, CoreLogic Inc., CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC, CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party CoreLogic Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zeeck, Phillip)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 6/21/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 6/6/2022. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on April 28, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ozark County, case number 21OZ-cc00216, filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7905550. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zeeck, Phillip)
April 27, 2022 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 5/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopherson et al v. CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopherson
Represented By: Kory D. Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Flood Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Olthoff
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Inc.
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Platinum Valuation Services, LLC
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Pahlmann
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Represented By: Jennifer Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Grennan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Represented By: Jennifer Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Country Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Represented By: Jennifer Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Brinker
Represented By: Jennifer Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Jo Bushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?