Merckling v. Midwest Technical Institute, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justyn Merckling
Defendant: Midwest Technical Institute, Inc. and Midwest Technical Institute, Inc. doing business as Delta Technical College
Case Number: 6:2022cv03212
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION to strike #9 Jury Demand filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant Midwest Technical Institute, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (King, Paul)
October 13, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to strike #9 Jury Demand filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Midwest Technical Institute, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (King, Paul)
October 5, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL-JURY TRIAL. Signed on 10/4/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2023 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for four days beginning 11/27/2023 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2023 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 11/10/2022., Discovery Motions due by 5/1/2023., Status Reports due by 12/1/2022; 3/1/2023 and 5/1/2023.) Discovery due by 5/12/2023. Signed on 10/4/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Justyn Merckling. (Groves, Greggory) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/3/2022) (Furtak, Rebecca).
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Justyn Merckling. (Groves, Greggory)
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Greggory D Groves on behalf of Plaintiff Justyn Merckling.(Groves, Greggory)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Stephen H. Snead(Groves, Greggory)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant Midwest Technical Institute, Inc..(King, Paul)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendant Midwest Technical Institute, Inc. to Plaintiff's Petition on behalf of Midwest Technical Institute, Inc..(King, Paul)
August 17, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/30/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 9/15/2022. Signed on 8/16/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant Midwest Technical Institute, Inc..(King, Paul)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County, case number 2231-CC00677, filed by Paul W. King. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8060423. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Removal Attachment B)(King, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merckling v. Midwest Technical Institute, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justyn Merckling
Represented By: Greggory D Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Technical Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Paul W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Technical Institute, Inc. doing business as Delta Technical College
Represented By: Paul W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?