Kirn et al v. YRC Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Colenan Kirn and Amanda Kirn
Defendant: YRC Inc. and Jerry Noeltner
Case Number: 6:2022cv03298
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc. Interrogatories and Request for Production to Colenan Kirn annd Amanda Kirn filed by Brian R Betner on behalf of Defendants Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc..(Betner, Brian)
January 13, 2023 Filing 18 RULES OF TRIAL-JURY TRIAL. Signed on 1/13/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER:( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2024 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for five days beginning 6/24/2024 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2024., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2024 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2023., Discovery Motions due by 11/15/2023., Status Reports due by 5/15/2023; 8/15/2023 and 11/15/2023.) Discovery due by 12/1/2023. Signed on 1/13/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Richard E. McLeod(Betner, Brian)
January 10, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Amanda Kirn, Colenan Kirn. (Glenn, Matthew)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian R Betner on behalf of Defendant YRC Inc..(Betner, Brian)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by J. Michael Ponder on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Matthew D. Glenn for Colenan Kirn and Amanda Kirn allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to allow Matthew D. Glenn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8219701) filed by J. Michael Ponder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attorney J. Michael Ponder added to party Amanda Kirn (pty:pla), Attorney J. Michael Ponder added to party Colenan Kirn (pty:pla))(Ponder, J.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Jerry Noeltner.(Betner, Brian)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of YRC Inc..(Betner, Brian)
November 23, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/11/2023. Rule 26 conference due by 12/27/2022. Signed on 11/22/22 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Brian R Betner on behalf of Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc. (Attorney Brian R Betner added to party Jerry Noeltner(pty:dft), Attorney Brian R Betner added to party YRC Inc.(pty:dft))(Betner, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc. (Attorney Kevin L. Fritz added to party Jerry Noeltner(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin L. Fritz added to party YRC Inc.(pty:dft))(Fritz, Kevin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc.. (Foppe, Patrick)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Patrick E. Foppe on behalf of Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc. (Foppe, Patrick)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Jerry Noeltner, YRC Inc. (Foppe, Patrick)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pulaski County, case number 22-PU-CV01485, filed by Patrick E. Foppe. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8202572. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Foppe, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirn et al v. YRC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colenan Kirn
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Glenn
Represented By: J. Michael Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Kirn
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Glenn
Represented By: J. Michael Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Represented By: Brian R Betner
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Noeltner
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Represented By: Brian R Betner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?