Ramirez v. DRS Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Ramirez
Defendant: DRS Contracting, LLC and Chad Mellentine
Case Number: 6:2023cv03188
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Phillip E. Oliphant for Brandon Ramirez allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to allow Philip E. Oliphant to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8542661) filed by Edward J. Rolwes on behalf of Brandon Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Philip Oliphant- Cert. of Good Standing)(Rolwes, Edward)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing: Donald R. Schoonover's Answer re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (Hanna, Jaime)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
June 28, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
June 28, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 7/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine filed by Edward J. Rolwes on behalf of Brandon Ramirez. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8511662. Service due by 9/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rolwes, Edward) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2023) (Furtak, Rebecca). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/28/2023) (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. DRS Contracting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ramirez
Represented By: Edward J. Rolwes
Represented By: Phillip E. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRS Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Mellentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?