Francis et al v. Mendenhall et al
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Francis and Thomas Francis
Defendant: Devon Mendenhall, Dakota Millard and Christopher Stanley
Case Number: 6:2023cv03237
Filed: August 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Lacon Marie Smith on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Sue Francis, Thomas Francis.(Smith, Lacon)
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Defendant Mendenall's, Defendant Millard's and Defendant Stanley's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Defendants Devon Mendenhall, Dakota Millard, Christopher Stanley.(Keck, Patricia)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER:(Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2024.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2023., Discovery Motions due by 3/15/2024.) Discovery due by 4/4/2024. Signed on 9/20/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 motion for protective order. Signed September 13, 2023 District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Clark, Christopher)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Michael Cordonnier(Smith, Lacon)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for protective order filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/26/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Protective Order)(Keck, Patricia)
September 7, 2023 Filing 5 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Linda Sue Francis, Thomas Francis. (Smith, Lacon) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/12/2023) (Furtak, Rebecca).
August 9, 2023 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/25/2023. Rule 26 conference due by 9/8/2023. Signed on 8/8/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Christopher Stanley, devon mendenhall, dakota millard.(Keck, Patricia)
August 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Howell County County, case number 23AL-CC00089, filed by Patricia A. Keck. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8564988. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-service documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keck, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis et al v. Mendenhall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Francis
Represented By: Lacon Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Francis
Represented By: Lacon Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Mendenhall
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Millard
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Stanley
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?