McTeer v. Caldera
Plaintiff: Gloria McTeer
Defendant: Zionua Caldera
Case Number: 6:2024cv03231
Filed: August 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2024 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Stephen H. Snead(Hansmann, Bradley)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:(Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2025.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 11/3/2025., Discovery Motions due by 8/18/2025.) Discovery due by 7/31/2025. Signed on 9/24/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 23, 2024 Filing 13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Zionua Caldera. (Hansmann, Bradley)
September 17, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES First Supplemental Initial Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Travis McDonald on behalf of Defendant Zionua Caldera.(McDonald, Travis)
September 5, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Andrew Keegan Tinney on behalf of Plaintiff Gloria McTeer.(Tinney, Andrew)
August 29, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Bradley R. Hansmann on behalf of Defendant Zionua Caldera.(Hansmann, Bradley)
August 21, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zionua Caldera Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Plaintiff filed by Bradley R. Hansmann on behalf of Defendant Zionua Caldera.(Hansmann, Bradley)
August 9, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/23/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 9/9/2024. Signed on 8/7/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
August 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Travis McDonald on behalf of Zionua Caldera (Attorney Travis McDonald added to party Zionua Caldera(pty:dft))(McDonald, Travis)
August 6, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (Hanna, Jaime)
August 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Bradley R. Hansmann on behalf of Zionua Caldera (Hansmann, Bradley)
August 6, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition on behalf of Zionua Caldera.(Hansmann, Bradley)
August 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Zionua Caldera (Hansmann, Bradley)
August 6, 2024 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zionua Caldera. (Hansmann, Bradley)
August 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Greene County County, case number 2431-CC00252, filed by Bradley R. Hansmann. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9138101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansmann, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McTeer v. Caldera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zionua Caldera
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansmann
Represented By: Travis McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria McTeer
Represented By: Andrew Keegan Tinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?