Derischebourg et al v. Simple Solar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dale Derischebourg, Jeff Derischebourg and Ronald W. Hisel
Defendant: Luke Arthur, Simple Grow Soil, LLC and Simple Solar, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv03252
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2024 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
September 11, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Simple Grow Soil, LLC on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
September 11, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Simple Solar, LLC on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
September 11, 2024 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Luke Arthur on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (Hanna, Jaime) (Main Document 2 replaced with corrected PDF on 8/27/2024, NEF regenerated) (Hanna, Jaime)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jose S Caldera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9172626. Service due by 11/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldera, Jose) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2024: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hanna, Jaime).
August 26, 2024 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 9/16/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derischebourg et al v. Simple Solar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Grow Soil, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Solar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Derischebourg
Represented By: Jose S Caldera
Represented By: Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Derischebourg
Represented By: Jose S Caldera
Represented By: Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Hisel
Represented By: Jose S Caldera
Represented By: Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?