White v. 16th District Court et al
Plaintiff: Joel Miles White
Defendant: 16th District Court, Mike Ferriter, Lisa Grady, Sam Law and Mike Mahoney
Case Number: 1:2009cv00165
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 7 MOTION to Remove Strike. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/9/2013. Mailed to White. (TAG, )
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 in full. White's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and his Complaint 2 is DISMISSED. The dismissal counts as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and the Court certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 2/5/2010. Copy mailed to White. (TAG, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis, 2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner filed by Joel Miles White. White's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis should be DENIED and his Complaint DISMISSED. The dismissal sho uld count as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and the Court should certify that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Objections to F&R due by 2/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 1/14/2010. Copy mailed to White. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. 16th District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Miles White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16th District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ferriter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?