Krohne Fund v. Simonsen et al

Plaintiff: Krohne Fund
Defendant: Stuart M. Simonsen and Kapidyia Capital Partners
Case Number: 1:2012cv00004
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. All Plaintiffs claims against Kapidyia Capital Partners, LLC are DISMISSED. (EMH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Kapidyia1. All Plaintiffs claims against Kapidyia Capital Partners, LLC are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/27/2017. (EMH)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have to and including December 29, 2017, in which to either: 1. Move to dismiss all remaining claims in the case against Kapidyia, or, in the alternative, 2. Move, with supporting brief and a proposed schedule for implementati on, for a specific program to be undertaken for such actions and procedures as will be necessary and appropriate to enable the Court to proceed to resolution of all remaining claims on the merits. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/11/2017. (EMH)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Stuart M. Simonsen against Krohne Fund, LP. (JEC)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Simonsen is entitled to judgment on Plaintiff's claims of fraud, constructivefraud, and negligent misrepresentation. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/20/2017. (AMC)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER- Singer and Griffing shall forthwith take all steps necessary and appropriate: (I) to comply with L.R. 7.l(c)(l) as related to the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Kapidyia Capital Partners, LLC;5 and (2) to provide the Court with a statement of such compliance on ; before June 7, 201 7 in re 133 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kapidyia Capital Partners. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/2/2017. (AMC)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Count I Fraud and Deception, Federal Securities Laws GRANTED. Count II Fraud, Constructive Fraud DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 6/12/2012. (EMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krohne Fund v. Simonsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krohne Fund
Represented By: J. Michael Ozier
Represented By: Kenneth D. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart M. Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapidyia Capital Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?