Hein et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: William Hein and Arlene Hein
Respondent: United States of America, Department of the Interior, State of Montana and All Other Persons Unknown
Case Number: 1:2014cv00055
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Estate of William Hein, Arlene Hein (AMC)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL. DENYING in part and GRANTING in part 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/6/2016. (AMC, )
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the United States motion to dismiss (ECF 36 ) be DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal based on Rule 12(b)(1), but GRANTED to the extent it seeks dismissal based on Rule 12(b)(6), with leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 11/18/2015. (JDR, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 21 Findings and Recommendations IN FULL. The State of Montana's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff William and Arlein Hein's motion for certification of state law is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/12/2015. (EMH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hein et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hein
Represented By: William M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Hein
Represented By: William M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: All Other Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?