Northern Oil and Gas, Inc. v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northern Oil and Gas, Inc.
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00090
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: RICHLAND
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Northern Oil and Gas, Inc., Northwest Farm Credit Services, FLCA against Continental Resources, Inc. (JDR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DISMISSING NWFCSS REMAINING CLAIMS. Counts 2, 3 and 4 as set forth in the Amended Complaint (Doc. 35 ) are dismissed without prejudice. NWFCS has expressly reserved the right to re-file these claims in the event the previous rulings of this Court granting NWFCS judgment are disturbed by appeal or otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/15/2017. (JDR)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Following Status Conference. Stipulation or motion to dispose of remaining counts not addressed and proposed final judgment due by 11/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/10/2017. (JDR)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 82 Northern's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Continental's Motion for Declaration of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/27/2017. (JDR)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying Continental's 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting NWFCS's and Northern Oil's 50 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report is due by 6/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 5/31/2016. (JDR, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Oil and Gas, Inc. v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Oil and Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Loren J O'Toole, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?