Alwood v. Ecolab, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Alwood
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00101
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 92 Motion TO ALLOW USE OF LAPTOP COMPUTERS AT TRIAL Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/27/2016. (Copies provided to Security per order) (AMC, )
October 3, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that Alwood's 59 First MOTION in Limine are DENIED in part (Motion in Limine No. 1) and GRANTED in part (Motion in Limine No. 2). Ecolab's 61 MOTIONS in Limine are DENIED in part (Motion in Limine No. 1,2) and GRANTED in part (Motions in Limine No. 3,4). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/3/2016. (EMH, )
September 29, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER ; RESET TO OCTOBER 5, 2016. All other deadlines pursuant to this Court's April 22, 2016 scheduling will remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/29/2016. (AMC, )
April 12, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING as to Alwood's age discrimination claim and DENIED as to all other claims 22 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/12/2016. (AMC, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alwood v. Ecolab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Alwood
Represented By: Alexander H. Rate(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Represented By: Roy A. Ginsburg(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William J. Mattix(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Amy C. Taber(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?