Jackson v. St. Vincent Healthcare

Plaintiff: Roxanna Jackson
Defendant: St. Vincent Healthcare
Case Number: 1:2015cv00115
Filed: November 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Upon the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 34) between the parties hereto, by and between their counsel of record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/21/2017. (EMH)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and denying 28 Motion to Waive Mediation Requirement. Settlement Conference set for June 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/15/2017. (AEC)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER on Jackson's retaliation claim under Montana Law is GRANTED BUT DENIED as to all other claims 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/24/2017. (AMC)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary Hurley Stuart for St. Vincent Healthcare. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/29/2016. (AMC, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. St. Vincent Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanna Jackson
Represented By: Eric E. Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Vincent Healthcare
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Represented By: Emma L. Savory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?