Hadley et al v. WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John L. Hadley and Carolyn A. Hadley
Defendant: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc., Montana Dakota Utilities Co. and MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Montana Dakota Utilities Co., WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. and MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Carolyn A. Hadley and John L. Hadley
Case Number: 1:2015cv00134
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: FALLON
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Upon the Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. 75), between the parties hereto, by and between their counsel of record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause, including all claims and counterclaims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/10/2017. (EMH)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER, The Court having been notified of the settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/25/2017. (EMH)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/14/2016. (TXB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadley et al v. WBI Energy Transmission, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Hadley
Represented By: Jared D. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Hadley
Represented By: Jared D. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Dakota Utilities Co.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Montana Dakota Utilities Co.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WBI Energy Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MDU Resources Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Abbott
Represented By: Stefanie L. Burt
Represented By: Clayton Gregersen
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carolyn A. Hadley
Represented By: Jared D. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John L. Hadley
Represented By: Jared D. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?