Latray v. Schuler
Plaintiff: Ronald O. Latray
Defendant: Daniel Schuler
Case Number: 1:2015cv00136
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER adopting 55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. Findings and Recommendations 57 withdrawn and replaced with this Order. Any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/20/2017. Mailed to Latray at MSP. (TAG)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any appeal of this decision would not be taken ingood faith. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/13/2017. Mailed to Latray. (TAG)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 in full. Defendants Motion to Dismiss 12 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/21/2017. Mailed to Latray. (TAG)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 in full. Claims against Defendants Daniel Schuler and Toman Baukema are DISMISSED. Claims regarding denial of access to the courts are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/23/2016. Mailed to Latray (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latray v. Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald O. Latray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?