Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Northwestern Corporation
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Defendant: Northwestern Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00005
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/21/2017. (JEC)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING 180 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/13/2017. (AMC)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 161 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/31/2017. (EMH)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS- READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/27/2017. (AMC)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING 121 Motion to Compel DEFENDANT NORTHWESTERN CORPORATION DBA NORTHWESTERN ENERGYS PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS and taking under advisement [134} MOTION to Compel ExxonMobil's Production of Documents. The Court orders that on or before September 6, 2017, XOM shall submit to the Court the documents identified in NWEs Supplemental Exhibit A for an in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/31/2017. (AMC)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING 133 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2017. (AMC)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING 124 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/25/2017. (AMC)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/7/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/22/2017. (S.N. in Msla notified to add atty to database) (EMH)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting Defendant and Third Party Plaintiffs 111 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/5/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/21/2017. (S.N. notified to add PHV attorney John Nettels to the database). (EMH)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ellen Herzog Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/22/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/7/2017. (copy mailed to attorney and notified CM to add attorney to database) (AMC)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 88 Motion to Change Venue for Trial Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/17/2017. (AMC)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Valerie Garcia Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/16/2016. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/1/2016. (copy mailed to Ms. Garcia and notified to add to database) (AMC, )
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING 45 Third-Party Defendant General Electric International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third-Party Complaint and DENYING 49 Third-Party Defendant City of Billings's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/20/2016. (NOB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Northwestern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?