North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Ahanu Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Ahanu Construction, Inc., Tajudin Mukadam, Alison Mukadam, Marc Donnot, Lisa Donnot, Malcolm Long, Karen Long, Kevin McGovern and Kelly McGovern
Case Number: 1:2016cv00104
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/5/2017. (EMH)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISMISSAL DOCUMENTS. Dismissal Papers due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/4/2017. (JDR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Deadline for Filing of Dismissal Documents. The deadline for filing of dismissal documents, currently scheduled for 7/3/2017, is VACATED. Dismissal papers due by 8/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/30/2017. (JDR)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Susan P. Watters, United States District Judge and referred to Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/27/2016. (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Ahanu Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad E. Adams
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahanu Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tajudin Mukadam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Mukadam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Donnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Donnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?