Farr v. Pinnacle Services, Inc

Plaintiff: Rex Farr
Defendant: Pinnacle Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00119
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: FERGUS
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 40 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/8/2018. (JDR)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 37 Joint Motion for Leave to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal. The parties motion is DENIED without prejudice. The parties may refile their request in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/7/2018. (JDR)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David I. Moulton for Rex Farr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn S Ostby on 10/31/2016. (JDR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farr v. Pinnacle Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Farr
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?