Tillett v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Jerri Joette Tillett
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Interior Board of Land Appeals and Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2016cv00148
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: BIG HORN
Presiding Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Copy mailed to pro se party J. Tillet) (EMH)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed Findings and Recommendations entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan (Doc. 48) are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Summ ary Judgment 25 is DENIED and Plaintiff Tillet's Motion for Summary Judgment 28 is GRANTED with respect to the Revised EA's discussion of the special status species Peregrine Falcon and Shoshone Carrot; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defend ants' Motion for Summary Judgment 25 is GRANTED, and Tillett's Motion for Summary Judgment 28 is DENIED, in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' decisions regarding impacts on the special status species Peregr ine Falcon and Shoshone Carrot in the Revised Environmental Assessment is VACATED and the matter is REMANDED to the Bureau of Land Management for further proceedings consistent herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Facts 34 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/28/2017. (EMH) Modified on 12/28/2017 Copy Order mailed to plaintiff J. Tillet(EMH).
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting Oral Argument With Respect to the Pending Motions and Associated Briefing for 12/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/22/2017. (Copy sent to plaintiff via certified mail/return receipt requested 11/22/2017). (JEC)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jerri Joette Tillett. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the proposed Findings and Recommendations 17 entered by United Sates Magistrate Judge Cavan are adopted in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jerri Tillett's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/11/2017. Copy sent to J. Tillett via US Mail 4/11/2017. (JEC)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, On February 16, 2017, the Court entered an order adopting Magistrate Judge Timothy Cavan's Findings and Recommendations. (Doc. 22). The Court's order was premised on an absence of timely objections. (Doc. 22 at 1). It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff Jerri Tillett timely filed objections to Judge Cavan's Findings and Recommendations. (Doc. 23). Plaintiff Tillett is entitled to de novo review of those portions of Judge Cavan's Findings and Reco mmendations to which she timely objected. Therefore, the order adopting Judge Cavan's Findings and Recommendations entered on February 16, 2017, is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/21/2017. (EMH) Modified on 2/21/2017 copy Order mailed to pro se party J. Tillet(EMH).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the proposed Findings and Recommendations entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan (Doc. 17) are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Jerri Tillet's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 1) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/16/2017. (EMH) Modified on 2/16/2017 Copy Order mailed to pro se party J. Tillett(EMH).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Case Management Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/30/2017. (Hard copy mailed to J. Tillett.) (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillett v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerri Joette Tillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interior Board of Land Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?