Opie v. CVS Caremark
Plaintiff: Rita Opie
Defendant: CVS Caremark
Case Number: 1:2016cv00159
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, without costs and waiving all rights of appeal. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/22/2019. (AMC)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AND 3 Motion to Arbitrate IS GRANTED. This action shall be STAYED pending arbitration in accordance with the parties agreement. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/24/2017. (AMC)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Counsel to Participate by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/27/2017. (Copy to C. Chandler and M. Cuthbert.) (JDR)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Susan P. Watters, United States District Judge, and referred to Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/13/2016. (EMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Opie v. CVS Caremark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Opie
Represented By: William D'Alton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark
Represented By: Leonard H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?