Sand-Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Theresa Sand-Smith
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2017cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER. Sand-Smith's 55 Motion for contempt is denied. Liberty Life's 58 Motion to stay the judgment is granted with respect to the attorney fees and costs portion. The order for attorney fees and costs is hereby stayed effective upon Liberty Life posting bond in the amount of $28,633.47 plus interest. Liberty Life's motion to stay the judgment is denied with respect to the summary judgment portion. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/19/2017. (EMH)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT in favor of Theresa Sand-Smith against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/23/2017. (EMH)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER- READ FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure58(e), the Court orders Sand-Smith's motion for attorney fees has the same effect under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4) as a timely motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/6/2017. (AMC)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Sand-Smith's motion for summary judgment 36 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Liberty Life's motion for summary judgment 39 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/20/2017. (EMH)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AND 10 Motion to Remand. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/28/2017. (AMC)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Via Telephone for the motion hearing set on 3/13/2017 at 1:30 pm. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/8/2017. (clerk notified IT) (AMC)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 13 Joint Discovery Plan filed by Theresa Sand-Smith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference now scheduled for March 3, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. as well as the February 24, 2017 deadlines for the parties' preliminary pretrial statements and their statement of stipulated facts are VACATED until the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) and Motion to Remand (Doc. 10). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/21/2017. (EMH)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston's application to admit Iwana Rademaekers to appear pro hac vice (Doc. 2) is GRANTED and she is authorized to appear as counsel with Mary E. Duncan pursuant to L.R. 83.l{d) in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/9/2017. ((K.H. and S.S notified to add Atty to database). (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sand-Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Sand-Smith
Represented By: Donald L. Harris
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Mary E. Duncan
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?