Carlson v. Teamsters Union Local 190

Case Number: 1:2017cv00043
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of Court shall vacate all remaining deadlines and take any steps necessary to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/6/2017. (JDR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/29/2017. (AEC)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER: It is Ordered that the Court's non-consent Order re 11 is hereby WITHDRAWN. US Magistrate Judge will conduct any and all further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/31/2017. Copies mailed to PLaintiff (AEC)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/24/2017. (AEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Teamsters Union Local 190
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?