DeCock v. SGS North America, Inc
Plaintiff: Richelle DeCock
Defendant: SGS North America, Inc
Case Number: 1:2017cv00057
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: TREASURE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/13/2018. (AMC)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Stay. PPTC and deadlines VACATED. Parties shall file a joint Status Report by 9/29/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/29/2017. (AEC)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/23/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCock v. SGS North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richelle DeCock
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Simkovic
Represented By: Calvin J. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGS North America, Inc
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?