United States of America et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, Steve Harman and Joni Harman
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, MONTANA RAIL LINK, INC. and John Does, 1-30
Case Number: 1:2017cv00059
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the United States, but DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Relators Steve and Joni Harman's claims against Defendants, with each party to bear their own costs. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/25/2018. (AMC)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Teresa A. Reed). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/3/2018. (JEC)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER pending a ruling by the Court on the Defendant's motions 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 22 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : ( Responses due by 8/21/2018., Replies due by 9/21/2018) Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/18/2018. (AMC)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice- LAUREN C. BARNETT. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/10/2018. (AMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Megan L. Dishong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Harman
Represented By: Jon M. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Harman
Represented By: Jon M. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Neil G. Westesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTANA RAIL LINK, INC.
Represented By: Trent N. Baker
Represented By: Peter F. Lacny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?