Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Big Man et al
Plaintiff: Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant: Alden Big Man, Unknow Members of the Crow Tribal Health Board, Joey Jayne, Leroy Not Afraid and Kari Covers Up
Case Number: 1:2017cv00065
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: BIG HORN
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion Appear at Pretrial Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/10/2018. (JDR)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDERED THAT JUDGE CAVAN'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ARE REJECTED. DENYING 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alden Big Man. AND 33 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/25/2018. (AMC)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 and 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/12/2017. S.N notified. (AEC).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; denying 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendants Motions are DENIED without prejudice. Defendants may refile their Motions, provided each complies with L.R. 7.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/5/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Big Man et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Torske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden Big Man
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow Members of the Crow Tribal Health Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Jayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Not Afraid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Covers Up
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?