Porch et al v. Ochoa's Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly D Porch and Michelle R Porch
Defendant: Ochoa's Construction, Inc., Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Golden State Claims Adjusters and John Does I through V
Case Number: 1:2017cv00093
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that the proposed Findings and Recommendation for disposition of this matter entered by United States Magistrate Judge Cavan (Doc. 80) are ADOPTED IN FULL.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order Granting Filing of S econd Amended Complaint (Doc. 27) is VACATED; and Plaintiffs' claims against PCIC and Golden state are DISMISSED without prejudice, to be raised again in the context of a separate action, subject to whatever defenses any defendant may have to those claims. (AMC)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING as moot 41 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pretrial Proceedings and Motion for Protective Order Pending the Court's Ruling on Def's Objections to the Fndings and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/2/2018. (JDR)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL. DENYING 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/26/2018. (AMC)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/28/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porch et al v. Ochoa's Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly D Porch
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Represented By: R. Russell Plath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R Porch
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Represented By: R. Russell Plath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochoa's Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Claims Adjusters
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?