Crown Parts and Machines, Inc. v. Euro Machine Tool Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crown Parts and Machines, Inc.
Defendant: Euro Machine Tool Company, Inc. and Frank Turi
Case Number: 1:2017cv00102
Filed: July 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/13/2020. (JDR)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/10/2019. (SMD)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/9/2019. (HEG)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Withdraw 4 Amended Complaint. Answer to Amended Complait is due 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/13/2017. (JDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Parts and Machines, Inc. v. Euro Machine Tool Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Parts and Machines, Inc.
Represented By: Gerry Fagan
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Machine Tool Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Turi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?