Berger et al v. Bank of Colorado
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Berger, Tami M. Berger, Wibaux 1, LLC and Pro-Frac Heating & Trucking, LLC
Defendant: Bank of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2017cv00104
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/16/2018. (AMC)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 39 Unopposed Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/27/2018. (JDR)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 3 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/27/2017. (JDR)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - John O' Brien. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/10/2017. (JEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger et al v. Bank of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Colorado
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Keller
Represented By: Carey E. Matovich
Represented By: John O'Brien
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Berger
Represented By: Tucker P. Gannett
Represented By: Donald L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami M. Berger
Represented By: Tucker P. Gannett
Represented By: Donald L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wibaux 1, LLC
Represented By: Tucker P. Gannett
Represented By: Donald L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro-Frac Heating & Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Tucker P. Gannett
Represented By: Donald L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?