Nott-Parker v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Jacob Nott-Parker
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00131
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: CARBON
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/20/2019. (AMC)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING NON-RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES. The Court approves the parties' 16 Stipulation. Plaintiff's claim for attorney fees is hereby dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/13/2018. (EMH)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Judge Susan P. Watters and referred to Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/20/2017. (AEC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nott-Parker v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Nott-Parker
Represented By: Shane Colton
Represented By: Jaclyn S. Laferriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?