Chenoweth v. Yellowstone County

Plaintiff: Adam Chenoweth
Defendant: Yellowstone County, Mike Linder, John Does 1 through 5 and Corporations A, B, and C
Case Number: 1:2017cv00150
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 38:2022
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Yellowstone County's 52 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/27/2019. (EMH)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re 55 Unopposed Motion to Release of Information. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Montana National Guard is authorized to release Privacy Act, U.S.C. 5 U.S.C. § 552a, information concerning Adam Chenoweth to the parties in this case. Th e Montana National Guard is further authorized to release to the parties Privacy Act protected information in its possession concerning others, if that information meets the requirements for relevance in this case, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/26/2019. (EMH)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Yellowstone County's 46 Motion for Order Authorizing Release of Information. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/11/2019. (EMH)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Yellowstone County's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted with respect to punitive and emotional distress damages and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/14/2019. (EMH)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. The telephonic conference set for January 23, 2019 is VACATED. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/17/2019. (EMH)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Stipulation filed by Yellowstone County. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/19/2018. (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenoweth v. Yellowstone County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Chenoweth
Represented By: Jason A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone County
Represented By: Kevin Gillen
Represented By: Levi A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Linder
Represented By: Kevin Gillen
Represented By: Levi A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations A, B, and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?