Metcalf v. ONEOK, Inc.
Plaintiff: Misty Metcalf
Defendant: ONEOK, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00011
Filed: January 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: RICHLAND
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Cavan
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of ONEOK, Inc. against Misty Metcalf (EMH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IT HEREBY ORDERED that the proposed 28 Findings and Recommendations entered by the United States Magistrate Judge are ADOPTED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ONEOK, Inc's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/1/2019. (EMH)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO STRIKE re 18 Amended Complaint filed by Misty Metcalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/14/2018. (JDR)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(l)(B), the case is referred to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(l)(A). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/22/2018. (AMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalf v. ONEOK, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Metcalf
Represented By: Brandon C. Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEOK, Inc.
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: W. Scott Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?