Green et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Plaintiff: Scott Green and Durene Green
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2018cv00114
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any and all causes of action between plaintiff's DURENE GREEN and SCOTT GREEN, and Defendant SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for 10/9/2018 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan and all associated deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/21/2018. (EMH)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/2/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/2/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/2/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/15/2018. (JDR)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Daniel L. Snedigar, Carey E. Matovich, Ryan J. Gustafson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/30/2018. (JEC)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois filed by Durene Green, Scott Green. (JEC)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT CASE REGISTER REPORT DV 18-1010, MT 13th JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, YELLOWSTONE COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 State court file, #2 Receipt) (JEC)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Matovich, Carey)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Matovich, Carey)
August 7, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2175060 (JDR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from 13th Judicial District, case number DV 18-1010., filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court File) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Green
Represented By: Daniel L. Snedigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durene Green
Represented By: Daniel L. Snedigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Carey E. Matovich
Represented By: Ryan J. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?