Kathrens et al v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: The Cloud Foundation and Ginger Kathrens
Defendant: David LeFevre, Brian Steed and Ryan Zinke
Case Number: 1:2018cv00125
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING CASE. GRANTING #20 Joint MOTION to Stay Case and to Cancel Proceedings filed by Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke, David LeFevre ( Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2018.)Preliminary Injunction Hearing scheduled for 9/28/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/10/2018. (AMC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay Case and to Cancel Proceedings Shaun M. Pettigrew appearing for Defendants David LeFevre, Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Pettigrew, Shaun)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Plaintiffs' application for TRO is GRANTED. Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from conducting the wild horse gather set for September 2, 2018, pending a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing set on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on 9/28/2018 at 9:30 a.m., in Billings, MT. (Briefing schedule in Order). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/31/2018. (EMH)
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation. (Lewis, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 ERRATA #16 Reply to Response to Motion, Updated Index of Exhibits. (Smith, Rebecca)
August 28, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U) (Smith, Rebecca)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by David LeFevre, Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke re #13 Administrative Record Filing Corrected Index (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Index of Contents of Preliminary Administrative Record) (Pettigrew, Shaun)
August 27, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David LeFevre, Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2006 Order, #2 Exhibit 2009 Order, #3 Exhibit 2015 Order, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jerrie Bertola) (Dilley, Jonelle)
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 Administrative Record filed by David LeFevre, Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Contents of Preliminary Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jerrie Bertola) (Pettigrew, Shaun)
August 27, 2018 Remark: PHV attorney's Katherine Anne Meyer and Elizabeth Leigh Lewis are now registered e-filers and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
August 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan no longer assigned to case. (EMH)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Pursuant to the Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is unreferred to United States Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan and referred back to Judge Susan P. Watters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government's Response brief shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. today, 8/27/2018. The plaintiff's Reply brief shall be filed by 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 8/28/2018. The motion shall be deemed submitted after 12:00 p.m., Tuesday Agust 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/27/2018. (EMH)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 CM ECF Registration letter mailed to admitted PHV attorney's Katherine A. Meyer and Elizabeth L. Lewis with copy of order. (EMH)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion's #8 Unopposed MOTION Katherine Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #9 Unopposed MOTION Elizabeth Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted on the condition that Ms. Meyer and Ms. Lewis shall do their own work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Ms. Meyer and Ms. Lewis, within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, file pleadings acknowledging their admissions under the terms set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/27/2018. (EMH)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION Elizabeth Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2184906.) Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Lewis) (Smith, Rebecca)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Katherine Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2184904.) Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine Meyer) (Smith, Rebecca)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION FOR A TELECONFERENCE REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Smith, Rebecca)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kathrens Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - 2009 Management Plan, #3 Exhibit C - BLM Handbook Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Final EA Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - 2009 Decision Record Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F - Preliminary EA Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G - Cothran Genetic Analysis, #8 Exhibit H - Review Admin Pastures, #9 Exhibit I - Billings Field Office Approve Plan Excerpts, #10 Exhibit J - AML Recalculation Report Excerpts, #11 Exhibit K - Cloud Fdn Comments, #12 Exhibit L - MOU BLM & Pryor Mustang Center, #13 Exhibit M - Pryor Mustang Center Comments, #14 Exhibit N - FONSI & Decision Record, #15 Exhibit O - BLM Advisory Board Announcement, #16 Exhibit P - BLM Letter Inviting Comments on AML Recalculation, #17 Exhibit 1984 Herd Management Plan Excerpts) (Smith, Rebecca)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Smith, Rebecca)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M. Pettigrew on behalf of All Defendants (Pettigrew, Shaun)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle Mary Dilley on behalf of All Defendants (Dilley, Jonelle)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Originals mailed to R. Smith) (AEC)
August 17, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2181262. (AEC)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David LeFevre, Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke, filed by Ginger Kathrens, The Cloud Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathrens et al v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David LeFevre
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonelle Mary Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steed
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonelle Mary Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonelle Mary Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cloud Foundation
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Represented By: Katherine Anne Meyer
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Kathrens
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Represented By: Katherine Anne Meyer
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?