Kreilaus v. Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Kreilaus
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC and Chad Oakland
Case Number: 1:2018cv00142
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
0 Judge: Timothy J Cavan
1 Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/16/2018. (JDR)
November 16, 2018 8 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Philip A. Hohenlohe, Justin J. Hagel. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/3/2018. (JEC)
November 16, 2018 7 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Philip A. Hohenlohe appearing for Plaintiff Joshua Kreilaus Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Hohenlohe, Philip)
November 14, 2018 6 Featured Case PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/4/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/14/2018. (JDR)
November 14, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chad Oakland, Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC. (Hagel, Justin)
October 9, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Kreilaus. Chad Oakland waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Hohenlohe, Philip)
October 9, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Kreilaus. Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Hohenlohe, Philip)
September 21, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Chad Oakland, Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC. Originals sent via US mail to plaintiff. (JEC)
September 20, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2197322. (JEC)
September 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Chad Oakland, Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC filed by Joshua Kreilaus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreilaus v. Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaks Disposal Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Justin J. Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Oakland
Represented By: Justin J. Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Kreilaus
Represented By: Philip A. Hohenlohe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?